DomainMarket LLC v. Lakes Gas Co
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01089 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2020 1:20 AM PST |
Defendant
Lakes Gas Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DomainMarket LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Tue 09/17 1:41 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SWT) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion
Mon 09/09 2:17 PM
ORDER re Parties'16 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice: It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 09/06 2:09 PM
Stipulated MOTION For Dismissal With Prejudice , filed by Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC. Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Rava, William) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/04 2:32 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 08/26 10:10 AM
LETTER from Defendant Lakes Gas Co. regarding settlement filed by Lakes Gas Co (O'Shea, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Order
Thu 08/01 3:59 PM
ORDER re Parties'12 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint: The time for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to 8/27/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/31 10:06 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by parties (O'Shea, Timothy) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/31 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Lakes Gas Co. (O'Shea, Timothy) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 9:45 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Lakes Gas Co on 7/17/2019 (Lance, Holly) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/18 12:14 PM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Holly Lance for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/18 11:26 AM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James L. Bikoff for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/17 4:29 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Holly B. Lance FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5849873 (Rava, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/17 4:23 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James L. Bikoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5849831 (Rava, William) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Tue 07/16 12:37 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 12:37 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Lakes Gas Co (SNP) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Notice to Filer
Tue 07/16 12:30 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: re1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 10:39 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DM Holdings LLC for DomainMarket LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DomainMarket LLC (Rava, William) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/16 10:00 AM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Tue 07/16 10:02 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/23/2019. (SNP) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Lakes Gas Co. Attorney William C Rava added to party DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com(pty:pla), filed by DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com.(Rava, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) |