New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:19-cv-15432
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2019
Re-opened:Oct 14, 2021
Terminated:Oct 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2020 3:18 AM EST
Counter Claimant
BIOTHRIVE SCIENCES, LLC
Represented By
THOMAS PASCHOS
Thomas Paschos & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
JAMES A HORAN
Represented By
THOMAS PASCHOS
Thomas Paschos & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
QUTEN RESEARCH INSTITUTE, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL J. COHEN
Newman & Simpson, LLP
contact info
Defendant
BIOTHRIVE SCIENCES, LLC
Represented By
THOMAS PASCHOS
Thomas Paschos & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
JAMES A HORAN
Represented By
THOMAS PASCHOS
Thomas Paschos & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
PHARMA-NATURAL INC.
Plaintiff
QUTEN RESEARCH INSTITUTE, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL J. COHEN
Newman & Simpson, LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2021
ORDER ADOPTING 78 Judge Wettre's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/15/2021. (lag, )

Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Thursday, October 14, 2021
95 95 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 10/14 11:52 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen the case and make a new and separate docket entry reading CIVIL CASE REOPENED and this is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/14/2021. (sm)
Related: [-]