Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02150
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2019
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2020 3:13 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MCCLAIN
Represented By
SHANNON MARIE LUKEI
Robinson Calcagnie Inc - New Port Beach Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
6 6 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/05 1:58 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 5:24 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MICHAEL MCCLAIN. (LUKEI, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/15 5:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aearo Technologies LLC on 08/26/2019, filed by MICHAEL MCCLAIN. (LUKEI, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/15 5:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on 3M Company on 08/29/2019, filed by MICHAEL MCCLAIN. (LUKEI, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/18 1:44 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/17 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4555183.), filed by MICHAEL MCCLAIN. (LUKEI, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for 3M Company,
Att: 2 Summons for Aearo Technologies LLC,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 07/17 3:54 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]