Washington Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Whitman L Holt
Case #: 2:19-bk-01891
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Sep 05, 2019
Discharge Objection Deadline:Nov 04, 2019

Debtor
Rodeo Roofing, LLC
4901 #6 Rd
Ellensburg, WA 98926
Represented By
William L Hames
Hames Anderson & Whitlows Ps
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Matthew J Anderton
Anderton Firm PO Box 711
Yakima, WA 98907
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
US Court House 920 W Riverside Ave, Suite 593
Spokane, WA 99201


Docket last updated: 07/18/2019 12:00 AM PDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 07/17 2:22 PM
CHAPTER 7 Voluntary Petition and Accompanying Documents Non-Individual, Fee Amount $335. Receipt Number A7390593, (Hames, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Witness Wed 07/17 2:24 PM
STATEMENT of Witness to Signing of Document Related [+]. Filed by William L Hames on behalf of Rodeo Roofing, LLC (Hames, William)
Related: [-] Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) and Accompanying Documents1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 07/17 2:25 PM
FIRST Meeting of Creditors Scheduled 9/5/2019 at 09:00 AM at Red Lion Hotel Yakima Center, 607 E Yakima Ave, Yakima WA 98901. (Hames, William)
Related: [-]