Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02163
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JESSE WETHINGTON
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, October 27, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/27 11:02 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JESSE WETHINGTON. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/19 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4555782.), filed by JESSE WETHINGTON. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/18 2:18 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]