Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02164
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER ADCOCK
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 4:22 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by CHRISTOPHER ADCOCK. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/19 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4555791.), filed by CHRISTOPHER ADCOCK,. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/18 2:21 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]