Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:19-cv-12115
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2019
Terminated:Feb 21, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2020 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
CNC RECYCLING LLC
7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C
El Paso, TX 79915
Represented By
David M. Zack
Blevins Sanborn Jezdimir Zack PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC
Represented By
Katelyn D. Crysler
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Ewelina Sawicka
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
Michael G. Brady
Warner, Norcross,
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2020
33 33 order Judgment - Default Fri 02/21 10:00 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 10:03 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re33 Default Judgment on CNC RECYCLING LLC at 7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C, El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (RLou)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 02/21 10:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Settlement Conference on 4/13/2020 is Cancelled re25 Notice to Appear (MWil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
32 32 motion Default Judgment Tue 02/18 9:55 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to CNC RECYCLING LLC by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration
Friday, February 14, 2020
31 31 3 pgs order Order Fri 02/14 12:42 PM
ORDER Finding Defendant in Default. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 02/14 12:44 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re31 Order, on CNC RECYCLING LLC at 7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C, El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 02/11 9:55 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference on 2/14/2020 is Cancelled re28 Notice to Appear (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 02/11 9:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Notice of Telephonic Status Conference Cancelled on CNC RECYCLING LLC at 7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C, El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
30 30 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Tue 02/04 11:48 AM
AMENDED by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (Crysler, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
29 29 respoth Reply - Free Mon 02/03 3:36 PM
REPLY to27 Response to Order to Show Cause by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
28 28 notice Appear* Fri 01/31 1:34 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
Related: [-]
27 27 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 01/31 12:40 PM
Defendant's Response to24 Order to Show Cause, by CNC RECYCLING LLC. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 01/31 1:35 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re28 Notice to Appear on CNC RECYCLING LLC at 7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C, El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
26 26 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Wed 01/22 8:07 AM
AMENDED by All Plaintiffs Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Crysler, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
25 25 notice Appear* Tue 01/21 11:57 AM
RE-NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference RESET TO 4/13/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 01/21 12:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re:25 Notice to Appear on CNC RECYCLING LLC at CNC RECYCLING LLC, 7157 MERCHANT AVE., Ste. C., El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (MWil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
24 24 order Show Cause Fri 01/17 1:09 PM
ORDER for CNC RECYCLING LLC to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2020 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/17 12:25 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- Discovery
service Certificate of Service Fri 01/17 1:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re24 Order to Show Cause on CNC RECYCLING LLC at 7157 Merchant Ave., Ste. C, El Paso, TX 79915-1206. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
22 22 service Certificate of Service Tue 12/17 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re21 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by CNC RECYCLING LLC (Zack, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 12/17 3:44 PM
OPINION and ORDER Granting18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
20 20 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 12/16 3:07 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Katelyn D. Crysler appearing on behalf of FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC (Crysler, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/16 2:34 PM
RESPONSE to18 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney David M. Zack filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, December 09, 2019
18 18 motion Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 12/09 8:46 AM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney David M. Zack by CNC RECYCLING LLC. (Zack, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
17 17 notice Appear* Wed 10/02 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2020 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Wed 10/02 1:25 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after October 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Correction Wed 10/02 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Correction re14 Order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
14 14 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 09/26 12:14 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after October 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/26 12:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. Related [+] (RLou)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/26 11:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
12 12 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 09/23 4:08 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Sawicka, Ewelina)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
11 11 notice Appear* Fri 08/23 10:12 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . (BSau)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/22 10:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Zack, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Counter-Declaration
Friday, August 16, 2019
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Fri 08/16 11:51 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Answer due by 8/22/2019 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 08/15 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Zack on behalf of All Defendants. (Zack, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
7 7 order Vacating Show Cause* Fri 08/02 10:09 AM
Order Vacating3 Order to Show Cause filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
6 6 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 08/01 3:48 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Sawicka, Ewelina)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 08/01 3:34 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ewelina Sawicka appearing on behalf of FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC (Sawicka, Ewelina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/31 4:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CNC RECYCLING LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
3 3 order Show Cause Mon 07/22 9:44 AM
ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 07/19 12:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *CNC RECYCLING LLC* (SKra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 07/19 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC against CNC RECYCLING LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7329070 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Brady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 07/19 12:25 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]