Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02228
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2019
Terminated:Oct 29, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jan 18, 2020 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
EBONI WILMORE
Represented By
WHITNEY BUTCHER
Whitley Law Firm - Raleigh Nc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/29 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EBONI WILMORE (BUTCHER, WHITNEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 07/23 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/22 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WHITNEY BUTCHER on behalf of EBONI WILMORE (BUTCHER, WHITNEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4559192.), filed by EBONI WILMORE. (BUTCHER, WHITNEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons CEO,
Att: 3 Summons MN,
Att: 4 Summons CA
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/22 4:03 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]