Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02220
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jan 18, 2020 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DELBERT DENNY
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 10:58 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DELBERT DENNY. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 07/23 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4558881.), filed by DELBERT DENNY. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/22 3:50 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]