City of Middletown v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45651 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:19-cv-00919 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC as the Successor in Interest of Kinray, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. f/k/a Caremark PCS Health, L.P. d/b/a CVS Caremark
|
|
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Hickma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Kapoor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Middletown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:02 PM EST |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. from Judicial District of Middlesex, case number MMX-CV-19-6024949-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5318488, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc..(Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Walgreens Appearance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 All Court Filings, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice of No Pending Motions(Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daily, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019 Discovery due by 12/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
9 | 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
10 | 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,2 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,3 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,5 Notice of Related Case filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,6 Notice of Appearance filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,8 Electronic Filing Order,9 Standing Protective Order,10 Standing Order re Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019. [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removals | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Cerrito, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of John Kapoor (Richard, Steven) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Spears, Brian) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Eastwood, Janna) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Martin on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
18 | 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
21 | 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
24 | 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Danehy Cox on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
25 | 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
26 | 26 MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 Days Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to Complaint by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
27 | 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
28 | 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time until (1) sixty (60) days after this Courts ruling on any Motion to Remand; or (2) if this action is transferred from this Court to the MDL proceeding, sixty (60) days from entry of an order lifting the stay as to responsive pleadings in cases not referenced in paragraphs 2 or 3 of the MDL CMO-1; or (3) such other date as the court in the MDL proceeding may order, whichever is later to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
30 | 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
31 | 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
32 | 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference by Walmart, Inc..(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
34 | 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
35 | 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
36 | 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
37 | 37 NOTICE by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. - Removal Statement(Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B | ||
38 | 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
39 | 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
40 | 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sheldon, Tara) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
41 | 41 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Actavis Inc f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
42 | 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
43 | 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after ruling on motion to remand or lifting of stay Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by John Kapoor. (Richard, Steven) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
44 | 44 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/20/2019 [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
45 | 45 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/26/2019.(Perez, J.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
46 | 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate Multidistrict Litigation by Walmart, Inc..Responses due by 7/19/2019(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
47 | 47 MDL Transfer ORDER. Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 7/1/2019.(Perez, J.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
48 | 48 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Connecticut. Case number 3:19-cv-00919. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |