County Commission of Payne County, Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45653 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Northern, 4:19-cv-00320 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of the Mortimer Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 100, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 122, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 132, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 5, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
County Commission of Payne County, Oklahoma, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:02 PM EST |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by County Commission of Payne County, Oklahoma, The (Barron, Bradford) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | |
2 | 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2067091) by County Commission of Payne County, Oklahoma, The (Barron, Bradford) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | |
4 | 4 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number5 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | ||
5 | 5 ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel , transferring case (terminates case) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 7/22/2019.] | |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Northern. Case number 4:19-cv-00320. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |