New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:14-cv-01444
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2014
Terminated:Apr 28, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 6:21 PM EST
Defendant
Gladys Carrion
Defendant
City of New York
Defendant
Lavon Jenkins
Defendant
NYC Administration for Children's Services
Defendant
Office of the City of New York Corporation Counsel
Defendant
MSW Carol Neina Rogers
Defendant
Larina Woodie
Plaintiff
Michael E. Noak, Jr.
326 E. 65th Street #129
New York, NY 10065


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2014
Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re:4 Order of Dismissal,5 Judgment, to Pro Se Litigant(s): Michael E. Noak, Jr 326 E. 65th Street #129 New York, NY 10065 (nt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2014
5 5 2 pgs CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ama)
Related: [-]
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:4 Order of Dismissal,,5 Judgment,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2014
3 3 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/15/214) (sbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2014
2 2 11 pgs COMPLAINT against Gladys Carrion, City of New York, Lavon Jenkins, NYC Administration for Children's Services, Office of the City of New York Corporation Counsel, Carol Neina Rogers, Larina Woodie. Document filed by Michael E. Noak, Jr.(laq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 exh a
1 1 2 pgs REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michael E. Noak, Jr.(laq)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]