People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45657 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:19-cv-00682 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
American Pain Society, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
American Geriatric Society
|
|
Defendant
American Academy of Pain Medicine, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
People of State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Williamson County, Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/29/2019 11:42 AM EDT |
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-73 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3914624), filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc..(Bozarth, Troy) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Bozarth, Troy) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Bozarth, Troy) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Snapp on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Snapp, Erik) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-682-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information.(lmb) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Brochure | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Bozarth, Troy) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel L. Stanner $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3920805 by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Stanner, Daniel) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel L. Stanner on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 102) TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO in regard to MDL No. 2804. (cjo) [Transferred from ilsd on 7/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Southern. Case number 3:19-cv-00682. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |