Oregon District Court
Judge:Marco A Hernandez
Case #: 3:19-cv-01142
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2019
Terminated:Jan 16, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2020 12:46 AM PST
Defendant
Clair Ballantyne
an individual 7110 NE Glisan St.
Portland, OR 97213
Defendant
TranscendThem LLC
an Oregon limited liability company 7110 NE Glisan St.
Portland, OR 97213
Plaintiff
FreeToM Prosthetics LLC
Represented By
Jia J. Feng
Protea Legal Co.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 16, 2020
5 5 order Dismissal -Terminate Case Thu 01/16 10:28 AM
ORDER: On 12/27/2019, this Court entered an Order to Show Cause 4 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiff was ordered to respond to the Order by 1/10/2020. No response has been filed. Accordingly, based on the record, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
4 4 order Show Cause Fri 12/27 1:07 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The complaint in this matter was filed on 7/23/2019. On 7/24/2019, a Notice of Case Assignment and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order was issued, ECF3 , setting deadlines as follows: Discovery to be completed by 11/21/2019; Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order were due by 12/23/2019. To date, the required filings have not been made, and plaintiff has made no other filing or other communication with the court. Thus, pursuant to Local Rule 41-2, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff appear in writing within 14 days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. If response is not received by 1/10/2020, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 07/24 2:52 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/21/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
2 2 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/23 6:25 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by FreeToM Prosthetics LLC. (Feng, Jia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/23 6:15 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5935987 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by FreeToM Prosthetics LLC against Clair Ballantyne, TranscendThem LLC. (Feng, Jia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F