Vansant Coal Corporation
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30289
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30289
West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | B Mckay Mignault |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30325 |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Vansant Coal Corporation
1051 Main St
Milton, WV 25541-1215 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
court
Uploaded Creditors
Tue 11/05 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Amandus, Elizabeth A. (admin) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 08/10 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related Document:7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11. Notice Date 08/09/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 08/07 10:12 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 8/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at U.S. Trustees Meeting Room, Room 2009, Charleston. Dischargeability Complaints Due: 10/7/2019. Proof of Claims Due: 11/4/2019. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (jjr) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 08/03 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Notice Date 08/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
court
Uploaded Creditors
Thu 08/01 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Weintraub, Marc R.. (admin) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Administration
Wed 07/31 10:09 AM
Order Granting2 Motion For Supplemental Joint Administration with Lead Case 3:19-bk-30289; Member Cases 19-30323 Dominion Coal Corporation; 19-30324 Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC; 19-30325 Vansant Coal Corporation; 19-30326 Lone Mountain Processing, LLC; 19-30327 Powell Mountain Energy, LLC; and 19-30328 Cumberland River Coal, LLC. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (ljg) |
|
court
Entry
Wed 07/31 10:28 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the proceduralconsolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases ofBlackjewel, L.L.C. (0823); Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C. (4745);Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC (8795); Revelation ManagementCorporation (8908); Revelation Energy, LLC (4605); Dominion CoalCorporation (2957); Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC (6749); Vansant CoalCorporation (2785); Lone Mountain Processing, LLC (0457); PowellMountain Energy, LLC (1024) and Cumberland River Coal LLC (2213).All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all furtherdocket entries shall be made in, the chapter 11 case of Blackjewel, L.L.C. Case No. 19-bk-30289. (ljg) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010
Thu 07/25 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by David L. Bissett, Counsel for United States Trustee. (Bissett, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 07/25 12:10 AM
PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Debtor Vansant Coal Corporation Re:2 Motion for Joint Administration.. (Supple, Joe) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 07/25 12:08 AM
Motion by Debtor Vansant Coal Corporation for Joint Administration Debtors' Supplemental Motion for an Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Additional Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(B) and Local Rule 1015-1(B) (Supple, Joe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 07/24 11:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - all Schedules and Statements: Incomplete Filings Due: 08/7/2019. Chapter 11 Plan Due: 11/21/2019. Disclosure Statement Disclosure Statement Due 11/21/2019. Assets: UNKNOWN, Liabilities: UNKNOWN. (Supple, Joe) |
|
crditcrd
Auto Docket of Credit Card
Wed 07/24 11:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:19-bk-30325) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 3412178, Amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |