Cumberland River Coal LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30289
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30289
West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Benjamin Arthur Kahn |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30328 |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Cumberland River Coal LLC
1051 Main St
Milton, WV 25541-1215 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Docket last updated: 07/23/2019 8:00 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto Docket of Credit Card
Wed 07/24 11:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:19-bk-30328) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 3412190, Amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 07/24 11:31 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - all Schedules and Statements: Incomplete Filings Due: 08/7/2019. Chapter 11 Plan Due: 11/21/2019. Disclosure Statement Disclosure Statement Due 11/21/2019. Assets: UNKNOWN, Liabilities: UNKNOWN. (Supple, Joe) |