Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:19-cv-01767
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2019
Terminated:Jul 14, 2020
Case in other court:191st Judicial District Court Dallas County TX, DC-19-08913
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 2:33 AM CST
Defendant
Randstad Technologies LLC
Represented By
Stephanie Johnson Manning
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Esteban Shardonofsky
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Arlene S Steinfield
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Beth Watson
W. D. Masteron Kilgor & Kilgore 3109 Carlisle
Dallas, TX 75204
Represented By
W D Masterson, III
Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 08/18 12:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice re 17 Order, by Randstad Technologies LLC. (Manning, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
17 17 order Order Tue 07/14 9:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have settled this case. See Doc. 16. The parties have until August 29, 2020 to submit their dismissal papers. The clerk is directed to administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/14/2020) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 07/14 4:16 PM
Civil Case Terminated per 17 Order. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
16 16 adr ADR Summary Mon 07/13 4:50 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: 3. Prv Fee: $ 4000.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Steinfield, Arlene)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
15 15 trial Designation of Experts Mon 05/11 2:18 PM
Designation of Experts by Mary Beth Watson. (Masterson, W)
Related: [-]
14 14 trial Designation of Experts Mon 05/11 12:44 PM
Designation of Experts by Randstad Technologies LLC. (Manning, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
13 13 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 12/12 9:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion for Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/12/2019) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
12 12 motion Protective Order Wed 12/11 1:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Randstad Technologies LLC. (Manning, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreed Protective Order
Monday, September 23, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order For ADR Tue 09/24 3:15 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Arlene Steinfield as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/23/2019) (aaa)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/24 2:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2020. Motions due by 9/8/2020. Discovery due by 8/9/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/10/2020. Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 11/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/23/2019) Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Monday, September 09, 2019
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 09/09 2:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Mary Beth Watson. (Masterson, W)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
8 8 order Status Report Order Tue 08/27 12:03 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/27/2019) (zkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 10:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Beth Watson. (Masterson, W)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/30 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Johnson Manning on behalf of Randstad Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Manning, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
5 5 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/26 11:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Because Defendant's attorney, Stephanie Johnson Manning, states that she is a member of the bar of this Court and maintains her residence in Frisco, Texas, which is within 50 miles of the Dallas Division Courthouse, she qualifies as local counsel under Local Civil Rule 83.10. However, Ms. Manning must make an appearance in this case, register on ECF, and be listed as defense counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/26/2019) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
4 4 qcref Boyle Thu 07/25 1:00 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 07/25 10:04 AM
MOTION Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Randstad Technologies, LLC (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 07/25 10:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randstad Technologies, LLC. (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 07/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 191st, Dallas County, case number DC 19-08913 filed by Randstad Technologies, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10140266) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F