Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02333
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Plaintiff
PAUL LUCHETSKY
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 12:05 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PAUL LUCHETSKY. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/31 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, #1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, #2 AEARO HOLDING LLC, #3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, #4 AERAO LLC, #5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4563471.), filed by PAUL LUCHETSKY. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/25 2:52 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]