Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02351
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 3:16 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CORNELIUS DARTT
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 1:06 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CORNELIUS DARTT. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/26 8:17 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (alb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/26/2019) (alb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3M OCCUPATIONAL,
Att: 2 AEARO HOLDINGS,
Att: 3 AEARO INTERM,
Att: 4 AEARO LLC,
Att: 5 AEARO TECH
Thursday, July 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4563647.), filed by DARTT CORNELIUS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/25 4:04 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (alb)
Related: [-]