Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02380
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 3:18 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
STUART CHARLES ROGERS
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 1:29 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by STUART CHARLES ROGERS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/05 3:12 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, #1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, #2 AEARO HOLDING LLC, #3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, #4 AERAO LLC, #5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4563896.), filed by STUART CHARLES ROGERS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 07/26 11:02 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]