Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02502
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GERALD RAWLINS
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 12:41 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by GERALD RAWLINS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/07 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC,
Att: 2 AEARO HOLDING LLC,
Att: 3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC,
Att: 4 AEARO LLC,
Att: 5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Friday, July 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4565391.), filed by GERALD RAWLINS. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
Thursday, July 25, 2019
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/29 2:19 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (lsd)
Related: [-]