JONES v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-02518 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 3:16 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
SCOTTIE JONES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/30 12:57 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SCOTTIE JONES. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/21 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, #1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, #2 AEARO HOLDING LLC, #3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, #4 AEARO LLC, #5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (djb) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 10/18 9:35 AM
NOTICE Notice of Summons by SCOTTIE JONES (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Summons | ||
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4565131.), filed by SCOTTIE JONES. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/29 3:12 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK no longer assigned to case. (lsd) |