Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02528
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BRIAN TERRY
Represented By
SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON
Clark Love & Hutson Gp - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 1:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BRIAN TERRY. (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/06 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (toy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 9:23 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4565353.), filed by BRIAN TERRY. (HUTSON, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/29 3:36 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (lsd)
Related: [-]