Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02557
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
AARON LEACH
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 3:08 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AARON LEACH. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/23 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 10/18 11:13 AM
NOTICE Notice of Summons by AARON LEACH (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Summons,
Att: 2 Notice of Summons,
Att: 3 Notice of Summons,
Att: 4 Notice of Summons,
Att: 5 Notice of Summons
Friday, July 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4565662.), filed by AARON LEACH. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Create Case Association Mon 07/29 7:17 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/30 8:19 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (lsd)
Related: [-]