Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02580
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2019
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
3M PUERTO RICO INC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Plaintiff
XAVIER RAMIREZ
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
5 5 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/03 11:17 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 1:40 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by XAVIER RAMIREZ. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, 3M PUERTO RICO INC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 10/18 10:12 AM
NOTICE Notice of Summons by XAVIER RAMIREZ (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Summons,
Att: 2 Notice of Summons,
Att: 3 Notice of Summons,
Att: 4 Notice of Summons,
Att: 5 Notice of Summons,
Att: 6 Notice of Summons
Friday, July 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4565865.), filed by XAVIER RAMIREZ. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/30 9:21 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (lsd)
Related: [-]