Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen R Clark
Case #: 4:19-cv-02202
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2019
Terminated:Dec 31, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 2:22 AM CST
Defendant
Harold Barnett
Represented By
John J. Greffet, Jr.
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Columbia Maintenance Company
Represented By
James R. Wyrsch
Khazaeli And Wyrsch L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
William Hausman
Represented By
James R. Wyrsch
Khazaeli And Wyrsch L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
MK Maintenance, LLC
Represented By
James R. Wyrsch
Khazaeli And Wyrsch L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Charles Taylor
Represented By
John J. Greffet, Jr.
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Amco Insurance Company
Represented By
John D. Cooney
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info
Russell F. Watters
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By
John D. Cooney
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info
Russell F. Watters
Brown And James, P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2020
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Charles Taylor 14 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Columbia Maintenance Company, MK Maintenance, LLC, Columbia Maintenance Company d/b/a MK Maintenance, and William Hausman 16 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Harold Barnett 26 is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/11/20. (KKS)
GPO Dec 31 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, The Court denies 53 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay. The Court grants 38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and denies 61 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court denies as moot 59 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Expert E. Wayne Taff.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/31/20. (JAB)
GPO Apr 07 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in its previous summary judgment order, Doc. 74, the Court enters summary judgment against Frank Hausman, in his capacity as the personal representative of William Hausman's estate. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f). The Court determines that no genuine disputes of material fact exist and holds, as before, that AMCO's policy excludes coverage for employment-discrimination claims. Doc. 74 at 25. Accordingly, the Court enters summary judgment against Frank Hausman.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 4/7/21. (JAB)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
109 109 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 02/24 8:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to100 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harold Barnett, Charles Taylor,99 Notice of Appeal filed by Frank Hausman, Columbia Maintenance Company, William Hausman, MK Maintenance, LLC. USCA # 21-1822 and 21-1823 In accordance with the judgment and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. Appeal is AFFIRMED.(CBL)
Related: [-]