Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02704
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2019
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 22, 2020 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BLAKE MCCLURE
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/29 3:34 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. Any motion to reopen must be filed on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case only by August 25, 2022. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/25 11:53 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BLAKE MCCLURE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4566759.), filed by BLAKE MCCLURE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 07/31 8:15 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (lsd)
Related: [-]