Wright County, Minnesota v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45661 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01813 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Wright County, Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:12 PM EST |
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The , Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6988614) filed by Wright County, Minnesota. Filer requests summons issued. (Williams, Amanda) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (MMG). [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1813 DSD/DTS. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Noramco, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Ohio. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-103) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/29/2019.] | |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:19-cv-01813. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |