Arizona District Court
Judge:James A Soto
Case #: 4:19-cv-00383
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2019
Terminated:Apr 20, 2020
Case in other court:Pima County Superior Court, C20193130
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2020 1:46 AM MST
Defendant
Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated
Represented By
Carl Joseph Mudd
Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Chrisanne Marie Gultz
Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Robert Bryan Zelms
Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Gregory D Hofacre
Represented By
Ernest John Calderon, II
Doug Zanes & Associates Pllc - Tucson, Az
contact info
Rory Brian Riley
Doug Zanes & Associates Pllc - Tucson, Az
contact info
Douglas Randolph Zanes
Doug Zanes & Associates Pllc - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, April 20, 2020
28 28 order Clerks Judgment Mon 04/20 3:03 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (BAC)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/20 2:55 PM
ORDER pursuant to26 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint and all of the remaining claims asserted therein are dismissed with prejudice; each party is to bear that party's own attorney fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall enter judgment and close the file in this case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 4/20/20.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/17 10:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated.(Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Dismissal
Thursday, February 13, 2020
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 02/13 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 12/17 12:59 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/17/2019. (See attached Order for complete deadline details) (DLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 12/05 9:16 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Gregory D Hofacre.(Riley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Time Schedule Order Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 10/24 11:44 AM
First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Hofacre, filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 10/03 3:53 PM
First NOTICE of Deposition of Gregory Hofacre, filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/27 8:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Pretrial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2) and (3) shall be completed as follows: 1. Factual discovery and witnesses shall be disclosed on or Before 3/6/2020; 2. Plaintiff's initial expert testimony shall be disclosed on or before 12/6/2019; 3. Defendants' initial expert testimony shall be disclosed on or before 1/6/2020; 4. Rebuttal expert testimony shall be disclosed on or before 2/17/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/16/2020. The parties shall submit to the Court a brief Joint Settlement Status Report on or before 2/21/2020. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before 4/13/2020. [Review ORDER for details.] Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/26/2019. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Mon 09/23 3:06 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James A Soto: Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2019. Discussion held with the parties regarding this case and the Joint Report. The Court will issue a schedule order after 1/31/2020 (after dispositive motions are filed). APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Rory Riley for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Chrisanne Gultz for Defendant (Court Reporter Cindy Shearman.) Hearing held 1:58pm to 2:08pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 09/18 9:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING16 Joint Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically. Attorneys for both Plaintiff and Defendant are permitted to attend the Case Management Conference by phone. For further logistical inquiries, parties may contact Courtroom Deputy, Tiffany Dame at (520)205-4682. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/17/19. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP Mon 09/16 3:14 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management & Rule 26 (f) Report filed by Plaintiff Gregory D Hofacre. (Riley, Rory)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Mon 09/16 3:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Appear Telephonically For Case Management Conference by Gregory D Hofacre.(Riley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Thu 09/12 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Tue 09/10 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Robert Bryan Zelms. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Thu 08/22 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Gregory D Hofacre. (Riley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 2:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Fri 08/02 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Rory Brian Riley. (Riley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/01 1:45 PM
ORDER: This order requires the parties to file a Rule 16 joint report by 9/16/19. Parties shall appear for a case management conference at 2:00 p.m. on 9/23/19. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/1/19.(BAC)
Related: [-]
9 9 6 pgs order Order Thu 08/01 1:38 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at the same time they serve the Summons and Complaint; if these have already been served on Defendants prior to Plaintiffs receiving this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants within 14 days of the filing date of this Order. Within 7 days of serving this Order on Defendants, Plaintiffs shall file a notice with the Court indicating when Defendant was served with this Order. If all parties have already been served and entered an appearance into the record, Plaintiffs need not serve this Order as they will receive either a Notice of Electronic Filing through CM/ECF or a paper copy (for pro se parties) of this Order through the Clerk of the Court. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/1/19. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 07/31 4:13 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Automated Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
7 7 notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Tue 07/30 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/30 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (KAH)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 07/30 10:24 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 07/30 10:23 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 07/30 10:18 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17212876. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00383 TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Service Executed Tue 07/30 10:08 AM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule 102(a) Fastar Certificate upon Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. on 6/28/19. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 7/8/19.) (KAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 07/30 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20193130. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17212876 filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert) (KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D1,
Att: 5 Exhibit D2,
Att: 6 Exhibit D3,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental
answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/30 10:11 AM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint by Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(KAH)
Related: [-]