New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:19-cv-07164
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2019
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2020 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Peter Aceto
Defendant
CannTrust Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Greg Guyatt
Represented By
Isaac S. Greaney
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Andrew W. Stern
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Movant
Nick Haila
Represented By
Jeffrey Philip Campisi
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer Llp (nyc)
contact info
Movant
Integral Capital Management SARL
Represented By
Melinda Ann Nicholson
Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Justiss
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 01, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/02 10:44 AM
ORDER. In light of the termination of the lead case, In re: CannTrust Holdings Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 19-CV-6396, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order in, and to close, the three member cases: (1) Alvarado v. CannTrust Holdings Inc. et al., No. 19-CV-6438; (2) Jones v. CannTrust Holdings Inc. et al., No. 19-CV-6883; and (3) Justiss v. CannTrust Holdings Inc. et al., No. 19-CV-7164. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/1/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/29 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sac)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 18, 2021
29 29 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Sat 12/18 7:31 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/2/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 1:19-cv-06438-JPO, 1:19-cv-06883-JPO, 1:19-cv-07164-JPO.(Moya, Goretti)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Transcript Sat 12/18 7:30 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2021 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 1:19-cv-06438-JPO, 1:19-cv-06883-JPO, 1:19-cv-07164-JPO.(Moya, Goretti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
27 27 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Thu 09/02 2:28 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on: ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS: granting (148) Motion to Approve in case 1:19-cv-06396-JPO. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/02/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 1:19-cv-06438-JPO, 1:19-cv-06883-JPO, 1:19-cv-07164-JPO (ama) Modified on 9/2/2021 (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 09/02 2:32 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 12/2/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Interested parties shall dial (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 9300838 at the scheduled time. The telephonic Settlement Hearing will be held for the following purposes. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 1:19-cv-06438-JPO, 1:19-cv-06883-JPO, 1:19-cv-07164-JPO(ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
26 26 order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/09 11:20 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties, that: 1. This action is stayed until such time as; (a) the Mediator declares the mediation process has concluded; or (b) the Court in the Canadian Action lifts the stay of the proceedings in Canada, whichever is earlier. 2. The parties shall submit a joint status report in 60 days. 3. After such a declaration by the Mediator that the mediation process has concluded or the Court in the Canadian Action has lifted the stay of the proceedings in Canada, if this action has not been resolved, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the status of this action and, to the extent necessary, shall submit a proposed schedule for the Court's consideration regarding the timing for any answer, motion or other response to the Amended Complaint, which may include, without limitation, motions concerning the applicability or scope of any stay applicable to this action. 4. Any party may seek to modify or lift the stay for good cause shown at any time and any and all defenses or arguments with respect to such a request are preserved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/07/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 1:19-cv-06438-JPO, 1:19-cv-06883-JPO, 1:19-cv-07164-JPO (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
25 25 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 04/16 11:59 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: re: (28 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 28 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 28 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . MOTION to Appoint Gary Rosetta to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Gary Rosetta, (9 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 9 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 9 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. . MOTION to Appoint Jonathan Wong to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396-JPO; 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; and 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . filed by Jonathan Wong, (40 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 40 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 40 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396-JPO; 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . MOTION to Appoint Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP and Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Granite Point Capital Master Fund, LP and Granite Point Capital Scorpion Focused Ideas Fund, (22 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 22 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 22 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396, 1:19-cv-0643, 1:19-cv-068838, and 1:19-cv-07164 . MOTION to Appoint Jose A. Silva to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP . filed by Jose A. Silva, (14 in 1:19-cv-07164-JPO, 14 in 1:19-cv-07164-JPO, 14 in 1:19-cv-07164-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396; 1:19-cv-06438; 1:19-cv-06883 . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Integral Capital Management SARL, (18 in 1:19-cv-06438-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-07164 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . filed by Nick Haila, (18 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Integral Capital Management SARL, (21 in 1:19-cv-06438-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Integral Capital Management SARL, (16 in 1:19-cv-06883-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Integral Capital Management SARL, (11 in 1:19-cv-07164-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-06438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . filed by Nick Haila, (17 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 17 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 17 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Girard Sharp LLP and Gibbs Law Group . MOTION to Appoint Eric Glasson, Mike Hopson, Joshua Smith, and Ray Brubaker to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396-JPO; 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; and 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . filed by Ray Brubaker, Eric Glasson, Joshua Smith, Mike Hopson, (35 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 35 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396, 1:19-cv-06438, 1:19-cv-06883, 1:19-cv-07164 . MOTION to Appoint Miguel Chang, Gregory Fox, Cory Knipe to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approve Selection of Counsel . filed by Gregory Fox, Cory Knipe, Miguel Chang, (48 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 48 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 48 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06438, 19-cv-06883, and 19-cv-07164 . MOTION to Appoint Lee David Fitzkee to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . filed by Lee David Fitzkee, (12 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-07164, 19-cv-6438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . filed by Nick Haila, (13 in 1:19- cv-06883-JPO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396,19-cv-07164, 19-cv- 06438 . filed by Nick Haila, (47 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 47 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 47 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Igor Kobzar, Lyss Murphey, Robert R. Patraulea, and Ming Li to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396, 1:19-cv-06438, 1:19-cv-06883, 1:19-cv-07164 . filed by Igor Kobzar, Lyss Murphey, Ming Li, Robert R. Patraulea, (33 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 33 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 33 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Fernando G. Trasmundi to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:19-cv-06396-JPO; No. 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; No. 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; No. 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . filed by Fernando G. Trasmundi, (39 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 39 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 39 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP . MOTION to Appoint Mark Petersen to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396-JPO; 1:19-cv-06438-JPO; 1:19-cv-06883-JPO; and 1:19-cv-07164-JPO . filed by Mark Petersen, (26 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 26 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO, 26 in 1:19-cv-06396-JPO) MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Yin Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396, 1:19-cv-06438, 1:19-cv-07164, 1:19-cv-06883 . filed by Yin Zhao. For the foregoing reasons, Granite Point's motion to consolidate these four related cases, to be appointed as lead plaintiff, and to have Labaton Sucharow LLP approved as lead counsel is GRANTED. All other corresponding motions are DENIED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the above-captioned actions are to be consolidated under Case Number 19 Civ. 6396 for all purposes, including discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. Every pleading filed in this consolidated action shall be captioned "In Re: CANNTRUST HOLDINGS INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION." The parties are directed to file a status letter with the Court on or before May 18, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the following motions: Docket Numbers 9, 12, 17, 18, 22, 26, 28, 33, 35, 39, 40, 47, and 48 in Huang v. CannTrust Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 19 Civ. 6396; Docket Numbers 18 and 21 in Alvarado v. CannTrust Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 19 Civ. 6438; Docket Numbers 13 and 16 in Jones v. CannTrust Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 19 Civ. 6883; and Docket Numbers 11 and 14 in Justiss v. CannTrust Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 19 Civ. 7164. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/16/2020) (js)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidation - Member Fri 04/17 5:50 PM
CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-06396-JPO. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 03/03 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of CannTrust Holdings Inc.. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001-8602,..(Saltzstein, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph De Simone on behalf of Peter Aceto..(De Simone, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Isaac S. Greaney on behalf of Greg Guyatt. (Greaney, Isaac)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Stern on behalf of Greg Guyatt. (Stern, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/23 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Nick Haila. (Campisi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/23 12:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:14 MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396; 1:19-cv-06438; 1:19-cv-06883 . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .,11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-06438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . . Document filed by CannTrust Holdings Inc.. (Saltzstein, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
18 18 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/09 11:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Integral Capital Management SARL.(Nicholson, Melinda)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/09 11:23 PM
DECLARATION of Melinda A. Nicholson in Support re:14 MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396; 1:19-cv-06438; 1:19-cv-06883 . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Integral Capital Management SARL.(Nicholson, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
16 16 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 09/09 11:21 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:14 MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396; 1:19-cv-06438; 1:19-cv-06883 . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Integral Capital Management SARL. (Nicholson, Melinda)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Proposed Order Mon 09/09 11:20 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Integral Capital Management SARL. Related Document Number:14 . (Nicholson, Melinda)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Consolidate Cases Appoint Counsel Mon 09/09 11:19 PM
MOTION to Appoint Integral Capital Management SARL to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-06396; 1:19-cv-06438; 1:19-cv-06883 ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Integral Capital Management SARL.(Nicholson, Melinda)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 09/09 8:46 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey P. Campisi in Support re:11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-06438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel .. Document filed by Nick Haila.(Campisi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certification,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Firm Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Press Release
12 12 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 09/09 8:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-06438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . . Document filed by Nick Haila. (Campisi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 09/09 8:43 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-06396, 19-cv-06883, 19-cv-06438 , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel . Document filed by Nick Haila.(Campisi, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 09/10 10:33 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 15 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/21 4:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties, that: Defendant CannTrust Holdings Inc. accepts service of the complaint for itself only in the Actions as of the date hereof. No defendant shall have an obligation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaints until at least 60 days after Lead Plaintiff is appointed and has designated a complaint as the operative complaint or has filed an amended consolidated complaint. Except as set forth in paragraph 1, all defenses, including with respect to personal jurisdiction and service, are preserved by all parties. No more than ten (10) days after the Lead Plaintiff has been appointed and Lead Counsel has been approved by the Court in accordance with the PSLRA, counsel for any of the Defendants that have been served with the summons and complaint and Lead Counsel shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated or amended complaint and responses thereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/21/2019) (ne)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/21 3:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To The Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Susan L. Saltzstein dated August 21, 2019. Document filed by CannTrust Holdings Inc..(Saltzstein, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/21 3:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ETF Managers Trust, Other Affiliate ETF Managers Group LLC, Other Affiliate ETFMG Alternative Harvest ETF for CannTrust Holdings Inc.. Document filed by CannTrust Holdings Inc..(Saltzstein, Susan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/21 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of CannTrust Holdings Inc.. (Saltzstein, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
utility Case Accepted as Related Fri 08/02 10:49 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06396-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 08/02 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 08/02 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (bcu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Scott Justiss. (Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/01 11:22 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Aceto, CannTrust Holdings Inc., Greg Guyatt. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 08/01 11:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Scott Justiss. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/01 11:16 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/01 11:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 08/01 11:17 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 19-cv-6396. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 07/31 3:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CannTrust Holdings Inc., Peter Aceto, and Greg Guyatt, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Scott Justiss. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 07/31 3:38 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-06396. Document filed by Scott Justiss.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/31 3:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/31 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Peter Aceto, CannTrust Holdings Inc., Greg Guyatt. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17348186)Document filed by Scott Justiss.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]