City of Berlin, Maryland v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45676 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:19-cv-02021 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Company
50 West Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Covidien PLC
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 100, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Berlin, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:14 PM EST |
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8113970.), filed by City of Berlin, Maryland.(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 8/1/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/1/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by City of Berlin, Maryland was filed with the following attachments missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/1/2019.] | |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the MDL Panel. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/1/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:19-cv-02021. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |