Rivas Alfaro v. Barr et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Wolford |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-06571 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2020 3:40 AM EST |
Petitioner
Luis Alfredo Rivas Alfaro
A#097832106 BUFFALO FEDERAL DETENTION FACILITY 4250 Federal Drive
Batavia, NY 14020 |
|
Respondent
William P. Barr
Attorney General US Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Thomas Feeley
Buffalo, NY 14202
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jefferey Searls
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/24 1:33 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls, William P. Barr. The Government moves for voluntary dismissal of this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (TF) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Clerks Certificate
Fri 01/24 1:26 PM
CLERKS CERTIFICATE/Index filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals re10 Index (TF) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/23 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re10 Designation of Record on Appeal (Khalil, Adam) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/23 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re9 Notice of Appeal (Khalil, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Wed 01/22 4:11 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re9 Notice of Appeal CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Khalil, Adam) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 01/10 11:20 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 of the US Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Forms C and D must be completed within 14 days after the filing of a notice of appeal. Forms C and D can be obtained at www.ca2.uscourts.gov. (TF) |
||
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 01/09 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to7 Judgment,6 Order, by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Khalil, Adam) |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Thu 12/26 3:30 PM
STATUS REPORT by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Moar, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Thu 12/12 12:17 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Luis Alfredo Rivas Alfaro solely to the extent that the Court orders Respondents to afford Petitioner an individualized bond hearing. Signed by Clerk of Court on 12/12/19. (mailed a copy of this judgment to petitioner)(TF) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
12
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/11 10:18 AM
DECISION AND ORDER granting the petition solely to the extent that the Court orders Respondents to afford Petitioner an individualized bond hearing consistent with the procedures outlined in this order within 14 days of its entry. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/9/19. (mailed a copy of this order to the petitioner)(TF) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Reply/Response
Mon 10/28 1:25 PM
REPLY to3 Response to Habeas Petition,4 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Luis Alfredo Rivas Alfaro.(TF) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Memorandum in Opposition
Wed 10/02 4:41 PM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Moar, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 10/02 4:40 PM
Answer and Return RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls.(Moar, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/22 9:50 AM
ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an Answer with memo of law responding to the allegations in the Petition. Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of the Respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a written Response. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/19/19. (mailed a copy of this order to the petitioner)(TF) |
|
Att: 1 petition | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 08/01 3:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Luis Alfredo Rivas Alfaro.(TF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 -7 (missing exh. 3 cover page), | ||
Att: 2 envelope | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 08/01 4:05 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ROC011601 (TF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/01 4:10 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . Consent form, Privacy notice and civil case timeline mailed to petitioner. (TF) |