Board of Supervisors, Prince William County v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45687 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 1:19-cv-00365 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:11 PM EST |
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 - 100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of Supervisors, Prince William County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:00 PM EST |
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6567030.), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc..(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (rban, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. re1 Notice of Removal Notice to Circuit Court(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated Supplemental Notice of Removal(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
7 | 7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
Notice of Correction re7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand ,5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
8 | 8 Opposition to7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Notice of Hearing Date re7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand ,5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
Set Deadlines as to6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand ,5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
11 | 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
12 | 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Board of Supervisors, Prince William County (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr on behalf of Board of Supervisors, Prince William County (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593803. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593812. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18 Motion/Notice by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases(Rogers, Lauren) Modified on 4/17/2019 to correct filing entry error(acha, ). [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
Notice of Correction re16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593803. ,19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6595230. ,17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6593812. . An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. The filing user has been notified to correctly file the Pro Hac Vice Application form. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Notice of Correction re18 Motion. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
19 | 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6595230. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
21 | 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
22 | 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
23 | 23 MOTION to Stay by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
24 | 24 25 pgs Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Stay filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 17 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
Notice of Correction re23 MOTION to Stay . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
25 | 25 30+ pgs Memorandum in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Remand | ||
26 | 26 30+ pgs Memorandum in Opposition re6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER granting23 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/18/2019. (rban, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6599264.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6599266.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6599267.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
29 | 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
31 | 31 ORDER granting20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Brian Boone. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/25/2019. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
32 | 32 ORDER granting21 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kimberly Chemerinsky. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/25/2019. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 ORDER granting22 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Jordan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/25/2019. (acha, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
Notice of Correction re35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support. Motion filed without a Notice of Hearing or Waiver. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (choy, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
36 | 36 Waiver of re35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support Hearing by Board of Supervisors, Prince William County (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
Case electronically transferred to Ohio Northern. (aott, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | ||
37 | 37 Certified Copy of Transfer Order Entered by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 8/2/2019.] | |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-00365. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |