California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:19-mj-10177
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2019 12:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Efren Cardenas-Camacho (1)
Represented By
Danielle Rachel Iredale
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/03/2019 12:56 AM PDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
Arrest of Efren Cardenas-Camacho (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 8/1/2019 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 8/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.(vyc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 08/01/2019. (jxv)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho held on 8/1/2019. Appointed Attorney Danielle Rachel Iredale for Efren Cardenas-Camacho. Bond set as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho (1) No Bail. Preliminary Hearing set for 08/15/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Arraignment set for 08/29/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Detention Hearing as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho held on 8/1/2019. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (Interpreter Claudia Rubio Samulowitz). (CD# 8/1/2019 RBM 19 3:11-3:16-3:25-3:31). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Chiang). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell). (vyc)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Efren Cardenas-Camacho (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]