California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-02925
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2019 12:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Maria Monserrat Arzola (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Kasha K Castillo
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alicia Phillip Williams
Usao
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2023
JUDGMENT as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP: 36 Months; Supervised Release: 3 Years; Penalty assessment: $100 at $25 per quarter through the IFRP; Fine: Waived.. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz (sjt)

Docket last updated: 08/03/2019 1:03 AM PDT
Thursday, July 04, 2019
Arrest of Maria Monserrat Arzola. (no document attached) (nbp) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Monserrat Arzola.(nbp) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Maria Monserrat Arzola: Initial Appearance set for 7/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (no document attached) (lrc) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Initial Appearance as to Maria Monserrat Arzola held on 7/5/2019. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Maria Monserrat Arzola. Government oral motion to detain (Flight).( Detention Hearing - RF set for 7/9/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.) Preliminary Hearing set for 7/18/19 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Arraignment set for 8/01/19 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (CD# 7/5/2019 MSB 19-1:2:10-2:28). (Plaintiff Attorney Nicole Braerdariol AUSA). (Defendant Attorney James Chavez FD-S/A). (aje) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Maria Monserrat Arzola. (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
7 7 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Maria Monserrat Arzola. (no document attached) (aje) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Maria Monserrat Arzola (ADI, jmo) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kasha K Castillo appearing for Maria Monserrat Arzola (Castillo, Kasha)Attorney Kasha K Castillo added to party Maria Monserrat Arzola(pty:dft) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Maria Monserrat Arzola (Castillo, Kasha) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Alicia Phillip Williams appearing for USA. (Williams, Alicia)Attorney Alicia Phillip Williams added to party USA(pty:pla) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Maria Monserrat Arzola (1) $35,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/9/19. (jmo) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt:denying 5 Motion to Detain as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (1); denying 7 Motion to Detain as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (1). Bond set, order to follow. Preliminary Hearing Continued as to Maria Monserrat Arzola. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 8/1/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (CD# 7/9/2019 JLB19 1:53 - 2:07). (Plaintiff Attorney Nicholas Hernandez). (Defendant Attorney Kasha Castillo). (no document attached) (cxl) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (no document attached) (cxl) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
15 15 P/S Bond Filed as to Maria Monserrat Arzola in amount of $35,000, Receipt # CAS113917. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Document applicable to USA, Maria Monserrat Arzola.) (als) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
16 16 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Maria Monserrat Arzola re15 Bond. (als) [3:19-mj-02794-JLB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
17 17 INFORMATION as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (1) count(s) 1. (sjm)(jrd)
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Maria Monserrat Arzola. (sjm)(jrd)
Related: [-]
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Arraignment on Information as to Maria Monserrat Arzola (1) Count 1 held on 8/1/2019. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 9/19/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (CD# 8/1/2019 JLB19-9:33-9:46). (Plaintiff Attorney Nicolas Hernandez, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Kasha Castillo, FD). (rla)
Related: [-]