Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-bk-11739
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2019
Dismissed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Nov 04, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
IPic-Gold Class Entertainment, LLC
433 Plaza Real Ste 335
Boca Raton, FL 33432-3945
Represented By
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
790 790 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Wed 11/04 11:31 AM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 (NAB)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 11/04 11:33 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
789 789 court Withdrawal of Standing Order/Transcripts Mon 11/02 10:49 AM
The transcriber has withdrawn the standing order for hearings in this case at the request of counsel.Terminating EScribers, LLC. Related [+]. (EScribers, LLC)
Related: [-] 32