Staples v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-04495 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-01164 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2020 12:16 AM PST |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
800 North Lindberg Blvd.
St. Louis, MO 63167 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Staples
11350 Dronfield Terrace
Pacoima, CA 91331 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01164. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 08/05 10:48 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis), 4:19-cv-01164 SNLJ, Staples v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04495 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 143 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) | ||
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG) |