City of Lexington, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45693 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 6:19-cv-00021 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:12 PM EST |
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Lexington, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:00 PM EST |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, case number CL19000328-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $400, Receipt 0423-3122305) filed by Actavis, LLC.(sfc) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Actavis, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sfc) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. for Actavis, LLC. (Fee, James) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court for Rockbridge County. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/18/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3124067. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3124083. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3124089. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORAL ORDER granting9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
13 | 13 ORAL ORDER granting10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
14 | 14 ORAL ORDER granting11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
16 | 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark RX, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
17 | 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, LLC for Caremark, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
18 | 18 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Caremark Rx, LLC for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
19 | 19 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
20 | 20 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
21 | 21 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. re1 [Supplemental Notice of Removal](Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Lexington, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
23 | 23 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Lexington, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 Briefing Order regarding MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 22 filed by City of Lexington, Virginia, Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 23 filed by City of Lexington, Virginia. Responses due by Friday, May 3, 2019 and replies no later than May 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/25/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 Paper State Court Records received from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, CL19000328-00, consisting of 1 large manila envelope (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sfc) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
26 | 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Marie Fitzgerald on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. (Fitzgerald, Shannon) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
27 | 27 MOTION to Stay Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C..(Fitzgerald, Shannon) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28 Brief / Memorandum in Support re27 MOTION to Stay Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C..(Fitzgerald, Shannon) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 | ||
29 | 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Stay Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . filed by City of Lexington, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Actavis, LLC.(Fee, James) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
31 | 31 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re23 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C..(Fitzgerald, Shannon) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
32 | 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Lexington, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
33 | 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Lexington, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE by City of Lexington, Virginia re22 ,23 Notice of Supplemental Authority(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
35 | 35 MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal Brief in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Stay by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C..(Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Rebuttal Brief), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Order) | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. re27 [Notice of Supplemental Authorities](Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
37 | 37 ORAL ORDER granting35 Motion for Leave to File. The moving defendants are instructed to file the rebuttal brief as a separate docket entry in this case within 5 days of this order. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/9/2019. (mf) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
38 | 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION to Stay Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation -- Resubmitted per Oral Order (Dkt. No. 37) . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C..(Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Judge Urbanski Orders), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Judge Greer Order), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Judge Sargus Orders) | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
39 | 39 ORDER granting27 Motion to Stay Case. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Lexington, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
41 | 41 ORDER granting40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
42 | 42 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/5/2019.] | |
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
43 | 43 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 6:19-cv-00021. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |