Gomez v. El Meson de Pepe
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-23267 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2020 3:27 AM EST |
Defendant
El Meson de Pepe
|
|
Plaintiff
Andres Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Striking DE 5 by Andres Gomez (Leal, Alberto) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andres Gomez. El Meson de Pepe served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/12 8:30 AM
Civil Case Terminated, per4 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice. Closing Case. (ps1) |
||
Sunday, August 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andres Gomez (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to El Meson de Pepe. (mee) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 08/06 8:01 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against El Meson de Pepe. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11876542, filed by Andres Gomez.(Leal, Alberto) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |