Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph M Hood
Case #: 5:19-cv-00311
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Terminated:Nov 18, 2019
Case in other court:Fayette Circuit Court, 19-CI-2426
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2020 4:57 AM EST
Defendant
Coca-Cola Consolidated
Represented By
Jennifer S. Rusie
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Nashville
contact info
Defendant
Red Classic Transit, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer S. Rusie
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Nashville
contact info
Defendant
William Stinson
Represented By
Jennifer S. Rusie
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Nashville
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Myers
Represented By
Bethany Nicole Baxter
Joe F. Childers & Associates
contact info
Joe F. Childers
Joe F. Childers & Associates
contact info

GPO Nov 18 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Dft's motion 8 is DENIED; 2. Pltf's motion 9 is GRANTED; 3. This action SHALL BE REMANDED to Fayette Circuit Court; 4. This action SHALL BE STRICKEN form the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/18/2019.(SLH)cc: COR, certified copy to Fayette Circuit Court (US mail) Modified on text 11/18/2019 (JLM). Modified text on 11/19/2019 (SLH).

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2019
10 10 19 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Mon 11/18 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Dft's motion8 is DENIED; 2. Pltf's motion9 is GRANTED; 3. This action SHALL BE REMANDED to Fayette Circuit Court; 4. This actions SHALL BE STRICKEN form the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/18/2019.(SLH)cc: COR Modified on text 11/18/2019 (JLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
utility File Submitted Fri 09/06 9:54 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review:9 REPLY to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (SLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
9 9 respoth Reply Thu 09/05 10:36 AM
REPLY to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Susan Myers.(Childers, Joe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
utility File Submitted Wed 09/04 9:41 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review:8 Response to Order to Show Cause (SLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
8 8 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 08/21 12:13 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC, William Stinson4 filed by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC, William Stinson. (Rusie, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
7 7 1 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Wed 08/14 4:45 PM
ORDER: Defendant's6 MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re1 Notice of Removal is GRANTED; and Defendant's Responsive pleading be held in abeyance until after the Court has ruled on its Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2019.(SLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
utility Motion Submitted Tue 08/13 2:59 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re6 MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re1 Notice of Removal, by William Stinson (JLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/12 8:32 PM
MOTION to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance re1 Notice of Removal,, by William Stinson(Rusie, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting Defendant Stinson's Motion to Hold Responsive Pleading in Abeyance
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 8:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Red Classic Transit, LLC.(Rusie, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/06 5:06 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 1. Defendants SHALL SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Fayette Circuit Court; 2. Defendants SHALL SHOW CAUSE on or before 8/21/2019; 3. Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND on or before 9/5/2019; 4. Defendants SHALL file any reply on or before 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/6/2019.(SLH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 08/06 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jennifer S. Rusie has been filed by Red Classic Transit, LLC and Coca-Cola Consolidated without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 08/06 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-2426. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4430275), filed by William Stinson, Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC.(SLH) (SLH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Summons Red Classic Transit, LLC,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Summons Coca-Cola Consolidated,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Fayette County Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Att: 8 (8/6/2019) Exhibit 5- Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time,
Att: 9 (8/6/2019) Exhibit 6- Proposed Order granting Motion for Extension of Time
motion Extension of Time Tue 08/06 10:32 AM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND PROPOSED ORDER filed in Fayette Circuit Court by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Red Classic Transit, LLC, and William Stinson. See DE1 (SLH)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Tue 08/06 10:43 AM
Conflict Check run. (SLH)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Note Tue 08/06 5:12 PM
Clerk's Note: DE 5 Order was docketed in error & has been deleted. (KJR)
Related: [-]