Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02967
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2019
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday Feb 03, 2020 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSHUA PALMER
Represented By
MICHAEL ALAN YODER
Slocumb Law Firm - Washington Dc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 1:25 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 2:43 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT JOSHUA PALMER against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDINGS LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JOSHUA PALMER. (YODER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/13 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC,
Att: 2 AEARO HOLDING LLC,
Att: 3 AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC,
Att: 4 AEARO LLC,
Att: 5 AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Monday, August 12, 2019
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Mon 08/12 8:40 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Clerk will correct origin code. Re1 Complaint, filed by JOSHUA PALMER (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/08 8:17 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT JOSHUA PALMER against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDINGS LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4580918.), filed by JOSHUA PALMER. (YODER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 3M Company Summons,
Att: 3 3M Occupational Safety LLC Summons,
Att: 4 Aearo Technologies LLC Summons,
Att: 5 Aearo Holdings LLC Summons,
Att: 6 Aearo Intermediate LLC Summons,
Att: 7 Aearo LLC Summons