Kioussis v. Service Employees International Union Local 668
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Malachy E Mannion |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01367 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 03, 2020 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant
Service Employees International Union Local 668
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Kioussis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janine Wenzig
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Mon 11/09 9:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA issued.(McIntyre, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 opinion, | ||
Att: 2 mandate letter | ||
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
TPO (Transcript Purchase Order Request) Filed
Fri 12/27 6:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER REQUEST by Janine Wenzig (Beckley, Charles) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 12/13 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in Non-Prisoner Case by Janine Wenzig. Filing Fee and Docket Fee Paid. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0314-4955540. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Beckley, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Order Terminating Case
Tue 12/10 1:01 PM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), (1)The Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss plaintiffs FAC, (Doc. 19), filed by SEIU, (Doc. 25), is GRANTED.(2)The plaintiffs First Amendment claims and request for declaratory judgment in their FAC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(3)The clerk of court is directed to CLOSE this case.ORDER TERMINATING CASE.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/10/19. (bs) |
|
33 | 33
25
pgs
order
Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry)
Tue 12/10 12:59 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Service Employees International Union Local 668.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/10/19. (bs) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply Brief
Tue 12/03 7:55 PM
REPLY BRIEF re25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Tue 11/19 6:47 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Janine Wenzig.(Beckley, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 11/18 3:47 PM
ORDER granting29 ptlf's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Pltf. may file br. not exceeding 6500 wordsin length in oppos. to deft's mot. to dismiss.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/18/19 (bs) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Exceed Page Limitation
Fri 11/15 1:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Janine Wenzig.(Beckley, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/14 11:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 9/21/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/21/2020. Supplemental due by 11/11/2020.Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 11/25/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019. Motion for Class Cert due 3/2/20, Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/13/19. (bs) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Case Management Plan
Wed 11/06 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Janine Wenzig. (Beckley, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Tue 11/05 6:20 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 11/05 6:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 11/05 11:09 AM
ORDER denying22 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/5/19 (bs) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 11/04 8:57 AM
ORDER Presently before the court is plaintiffs amended complaint. (Doc. 16). Based upon this filing, the defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 12) is DISMISSED without prejudice.terminating12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/4/19 (bs) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Continue
Fri 11/01 5:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Janine Wenzig.(Beckley, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Fri 11/01 1:36 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William L. Messenger.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/31/19. (bs) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/29 2:46 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William L Messenger on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney William Messenger is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4912585.. (Messenger, William) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 10/29 4:25 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) |
||
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/28 6:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Catherine Kioussis.(Kelsey, Brian) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
18
pgs
respm
Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Mon 10/21 7:51 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of P. Casey Pitts in Support of Defendant SEIU Local 668's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 10/17 11:21 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Time to file motion for class certification. Mot. for class cert. due 21 days following court's disposition of deft's mot. to dismiss.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/17/19 (bs) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 10/16 4:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Class Certification by Catherine Kioussis.(Beckley, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Thu 10/10 3:24 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Reilly Stephens.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/10/19. (bs) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/10 12:06 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Charles O. Beckley, II on behalf of Catherine Kioussis Attorney Reilly Stephens is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4896567.. (Beckley, Charles) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 10/10 1:44 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw) |
||
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/09 1:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 01:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/9/19. (bs) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 10/07 7:28 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Tue 10/01 4:54 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to P. Casey Pitts.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/1/19. (bs) |
|
10 | 10
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Tue 10/01 4:52 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott Kronland.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/1/19. (bs) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 09/27 9:16 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) |
||
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/26 6:17 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott A Kronland on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 668 Attorney Scott A. Kronland is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4883357.. (Kronland, Scott) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/26 6:12 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by P. Casey Pitts on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 668 Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4883356., filed by on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Thu 09/19 3:43 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian Kelsey.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/19/19. (bs) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 09/17 10:18 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file supplement to Document 6. Signed Code of Professional Conduct Needed. (aaa) |
||
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/16 5:06 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Charles O. Beckley, II on behalf of Catherine Kioussis Attorney Brian Kelsey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4873118.. (Beckley, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 08/28 3:34 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Malachy E Mannion for all further proceedings. Honorable John E. Jones, III no longer assigned to case (eo) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other) - Do not use this event if this is a Notice of Appeal
Wed 08/21 4:28 PM
NOTICE by Service Employees International Union Local 668 OF RELATED CASE (Hoye, Lauren) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
Tue 08/20 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Hoye on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 668 (Hoye, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/07 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Service Employees International Union Local 668 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (aaa) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Packet | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/07 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Service Employees International Union Local 668 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4737200), filed by Catherine Kioussis.(aaa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |