Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:19-cv-02249
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2019
Terminated:Dec 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Feb 03, 2020 2:30 AM MST
Defendant
Melvin Moore
Defendant
Eleanor Sawyer
Defendant
PTS of America, LLC
Represented By
David Allen Belsheim
Mcconnell Van Pelt LLC
contact info
Michael T. McConnell
Mcconnell Van Pelt LLC
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Corrections, LLC
Represented By
Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Vaughan & Demuro-Colorado Springs
contact info
Ann Baumgartner Smith
Vaughan & Demuro-Colorado Springs
contact info
Plaintiff
Meshia Peltier
Represented By
Michael Paul Fairhurst
Killmer Lane & Newman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
93 93 motion Dismiss Wed 12/29 1:04 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant PTS of America, LLC. (McConnell, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 12/29 3:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to93 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/29/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc4)
Related: [-]