California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-03006
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Terminated:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2019 12:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Schlomo Schmuel (1)
Represented By
Richard A Moss
Moss Law Group
contact info
Harland W Braun
Braun & Braun LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Valerie Chu
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2021
Order Denying Motion to Seal 31. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/5/21.(jmo)
GPO Apr 21 2021
JUDGMENT as to Schlomo Schmuel (1). Count 1, Dft committed to the BOP for a term of 37 months, supervised release for 3 years, $250,000 fine, assessment $100. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant (sxm)
GPO Mar 02 2022
ORDER Denying Defendant's Motions for Compassionate Release [ECF Nos. 50, 68] as to Schlomo Schmuel (1). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/2/2022.(anh)

Docket last updated: 05/18/2021 6:23 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
1 1 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Schlomo Schmuel (1) count(s) 1. (dls)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Schlomo Schmuel (present) held on 8/6/2019. Bond set as to Schlomo Schmuel (1) O/R; defendant ordered to appear at USM office for fingerprint and release; abstract issued to USM. Bond packet due by close of business 8/9/2019. Arraignment on Information as to Schlomo Schmuel (1) Count 1 held on 8/6/2019. Change of Plea Hearing as to Schlomo Schmuel held on 8/6/2019. Plea entered by Schlomo Schmuel (1) Count 1. Plea Tendered by Schlomo Schmuel Guilty on count 1 of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Schlomo Schmuel: XK: 8/6/19-11/4/19. PSR Ordered. Sentence With PSR set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Information, waiver of indictment, notice of related case, consent, plea and findings filed. (CD# 8/6/2019 MDD: 1036-1058). (Plaintiff Attorney Valerie Chu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Harland Braun, RET; Richard Moss, RET). (PTSO: J. Lopez). (dls)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Schlomo Schmuel (dls)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by USA of case(s) 15CR2820-BAS. (dls)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Schlomo Schmuel: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Court excludes time from 8/6/2019 through 11/4/2019 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(1)(G). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/6/2019. (jah)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Schlomo Schmuel (1). Defendant is released on personal recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/6/2019. (jah)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Schlomo Schmuel. Defendant is released on own recognizance. (jah)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin by Schlomo Schmuel. (jah)
Related: [-]
9 9 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Schlomo Schmuel. (jah)
Related: [-]