Rajan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-02166 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2020 2:19 AM CST |
Defendant
Aetna Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivy Rajan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 5/11/2020.(CBC) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re23 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
23 | 23
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Ivy Rajan. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Wed 04/01 12:52 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Court has been notifed by email that this matter has settled, therefore the Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED. Settlement documents to be filed. (KAT) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Mon 03/16 10:11 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/16/2020. (KAT) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Mon 03/16 10:10 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED. (KAT) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 3/16/2020. See Minutes for details. (KAT) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Fri 01/03 1:16 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED. (KAT) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Mon 11/18 5:36 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/18/2019. (KAT) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER/NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Confidential Letter to Court due by 4/9/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/18/2019. (KAT) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/16/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/27/2020. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/7/2019. (KAT) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Thu 11/07 7:53 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/7/2019. (KAT) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Tue 11/05 9:46 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez will be held by TELEPHONE. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. (KAT) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Ivy Rajan.(Meyers, Heather) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/8/2019.(KAT) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aetna Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/14 2:55 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Aetna Life Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/14/2019. (NAH) |
|
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7081336 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 08/08 2:58 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2166 JNE/KMM. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7064714) filed by Ivy Rajan. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |