Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-ap-01212
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Feb 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
JN Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
JN Trucking, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, February 21, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/21 7:35 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01212 KHT Closed. (cag)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/07 10:27 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Wed 02/05 7:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (cag)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 7:41 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01212 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 2/20/2020. (cag)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
16 16 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/03 10:25 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Sunday, January 05, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/05 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Friday, January 03, 2020
14 14 order Abeyance Fri 01/03 12:43 PM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 2/3/2020 for13 , (cag)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Thursday, January 02, 2020
13 13 motion Abeyance Thu 01/02 4:17 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, December 19, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/19 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
11 11 order Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 12/17 4:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION BY DEFENDANT TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Related [+]. Document due by 1/15/2020 for10 , (mcs)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Extend Time
Friday, December 13, 2019
10 10 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 12/13 9:55 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To Respond to First Amended Complaint Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of JN Trucking, Inc. Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Saturday, November 16, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/16 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, November 14, 2019
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 11/14 7:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint JN Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 12/16/2019 Related [+]. (cag)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
7 7 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Wed 11/13 11:55 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of JN Trucking, Inc.. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 11/13 11:54 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of JN Trucking, Inc. Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 10/15 3:00 PM
Summons Service Executed On: JN Trucking, Inc. on 10/15/19 Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/15 2:57 PM
Summons Issued on JN Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 11/14/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/15 2:55 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against JN Trucking, Inc.. Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 08/08 9:50 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 9:50 AM
Adversary case 19-01212 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against JN Trucking, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]