Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-ap-01215
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 02, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
J & A Service, LLC
3166 Pipe Court
Grand Junction, CO 81504
Represented By
J & A Service, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Theodore J. Hartl
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
18 18 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Wed 03/24 4:44 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 15 Judgment for AP Case
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/02 8:13 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01215 KHT Closed. (cag)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 14, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/14 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Judgment for AP Case
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/14 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, February 12, 2021
15 15 order Judgment for AP Case Fri 02/12 6:42 AM
Judgment For David V. Wadsworth Against J & A Service, LLC Related [+]. (cag)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
14 14 order Default Judgment Fri 02/12 6:41 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against J & A Service, LLC Related [+]. (cag)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 02/12 6:44 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01215 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 3/1/2021. ***CLOSE ADV*** (cag)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
13 13 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/04 10:29 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against J & A Service, LLC Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, December 10, 2020
12 12 order File Thu 12/10 1:38 PM
Order for Plaintiff To File Status Report Related [+]. Document due by 1/4/2021 for1 , (cag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 19, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/19 10:30 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
10 10 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/17 4:24 PM
Virtual Clerk's Entry of Default As To J & A Service LLC Related [+]. (sml)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, March 13, 2020
9 9 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/13 4:31 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint,7 Summons Issued (auto),8 Summons Service Executed-Adversary
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, October 24, 2019
8 8 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 10/24 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed On: J & A Service, LLC on October 24, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 10/24 3:49 PM
Summons Issued on J & A Service, LLC Answer Due 11/25/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 3:49 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against J & A Service, LLC. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 10/23 4:49 PM
Summons Service Executed On: J & A Service, LLC on October 23, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/22 4:30 PM
Summons Issued on J & A Service, LLC Answer Due 11/21/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 4:30 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against J & A Service, LLC. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 08/08 10:19 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 10:18 AM
Adversary case 19-01215 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against J & A Service, LLC. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]