Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-ap-01217
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Apr 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Iron Ox Field Service, LLC
11691 N Uinta Canyon Hwy
Roosevelt, UT 84066
Represented By
Iron Ox Field Service, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info
Theodore J. Hartl
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/14 7:33 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01217 KHT Closed. (cag)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/30 2:21 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-1217 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 4/13/2020. ***Close ADV if no obj*** (cag)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Fri 03/27 2:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Amended Complaint,6 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 24, 2019
8 8 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 10/24 4:05 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Iron Ox Field Service, LLC on October 24, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 10/24 3:55 PM
Summons Issued on Iron Ox Field Service, LLC Answer Due 11/25/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 3:54 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Iron Ox Field Service, LLC. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 10/23 4:47 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Iron Ox Field Service, LLC on October 23, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/22 4:35 PM
Summons Issued on Iron Ox Field Service, LLC Answer Due 11/21/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 4:35 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Iron Ox Field Service, LLC. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 08/08 10:35 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 10:35 AM
Adversary case 19-01217 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Iron Ox Field Service, LLC. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]