Wadsworth v. Iowa Tanklines, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberley H Tyson |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01218 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Iowa Tanklines, Inc.
210 S.W. Linden Street
Ankeny, IA 50023 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/14 6:37 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01218 KHT Closed. (cag) |
||
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/25/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . (cag) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 06/23 10:52 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01218 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/12/2021. ***Close Adv if no obj*** (cag) |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/24/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES PURSUANT TOFed.R.Bankr.P. 7016(b) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)) RE: . Discovery due by 8/27/2021 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 10/15/2021 for1 , Written Reports due by 9/3/2021 for1 , (cag) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of Iowa Tanklines, Inc., David V. Wadsworth . (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/19/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Regarding Compliance With Rules 7026 . Written Report due by 3/22/2021 for , IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set, if necessary, after expiration of allpretrial deadlines and after the Court has ruled upon any dispositive motions or upon request of theparties. (cag) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Motion For To Set Status and Scheduling Conference Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Douglas D. Koktavy on behalf of Iowa Tanklines, Inc. . (Koktavy, Douglas) |
|
Saturday, January 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Service Executed On: Iowa Tanklines, Inc. on January 2, 2020 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Alias Summons Issued on Iowa Tanklines, Inc. Answer Due 2/3/2020. (cag) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Granting Motion For Alias Summons . (cag) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion For Alias Summons Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued on Iowa Tanklines, Inc. Answer Due 01/10/2020. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order for Plaintiff To File Summons . Document due by 12/18/2019 for1 and for , (cag) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee
Thu 08/08 10:38 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01218 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Iowa Tanklines, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore) |