Wadsworth v. Newfield Exploration Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberley H Tyson |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01219 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Newfield Exploration Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/03 7:57 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1219 KHT Closed. (cag) |
||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 11/15 11:41 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01219 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 12/2/2019. ***Close Case*** (cag) |
||
Saturday, November 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Newfield Exploration Company Answer Due 12/5/2019 . (cag) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Anthony F Pirraglia on behalf of Newfield Exploration Company . (Pirraglia, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed On: Newfield Exploration Company on 10/15/19 Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued on Newfield Exploration Company Answer Due 11/14/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 by David V. Wadsworth against Newfield Exploration Company. Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee
Thu 08/08 10:38 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01219 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Newfield Exploration Company. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Conrardy, Aaron) |